EP4246993 - FOLDED CAMERA STRUCTURE WITH AN EXTENDED LIGHT-FOLDING-ELEMENT SCANNING RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corephotonics Ltd. 146 Menachem Begin Rd. 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDENBERG, Ephraim 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
BACHAR, Gil 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 03 /
JERBY, Itay 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
YEDID, Itay 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 05 /
MANDEL, Yonatan 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 06 /
SHABTAY, Gal 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | 07 /
Cohen, Noy 6492103 Tel Aviv / IL | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Kasche & Partner Bühlstrasse 1 8125 Zollikerberg/Zürich / CH | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 23190556.3 | 06.12.2017 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | US201662439518P | 28.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662439518 P | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4246993 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4246993 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/64, H04N23/45, H04N23/55, H04N23/68 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H04N23/45 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N23/685 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B27/64 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B13/0065 (CN,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,CN,KR);
H04N23/58 (CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/38] | H04N23/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | GEFALTETE KAMERASTRUKTUR MIT EINEM ERWEITERTEN ABTASTBEREICH FÜR LICHTFALTELEMENT | [2023/38] | English: | FOLDED CAMERA STRUCTURE WITH AN EXTENDED LIGHT-FOLDING-ELEMENT SCANNING RANGE | [2023/38] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CAMÉRA PLIÉE AVEC UNE PLAGE ÉTENDUE DE BALAYAGE D'ÉLÉMENT DE REPLIEMENT DE LUMIÈRE | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 06.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17887407.9 / EP3563193 | EP21157082.5 / EP3842853 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1931135 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [ID]WO2016166730 (COREPHOTONICS LTD [IL]) | by applicant | WO2016052179 | WO2016057366 | WO2016056060 | US9392188 | US19670622723 | US19500623611 |