EP4274350 - CHANNEL OCCUPANCY STRUCTURE INDICATION IN THE TIME DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Rd. 1st. Hsinchu Science Park 30078 Hsinchu City / TW | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSAI, Cheng-Rung Hsinchu City 30078 / TW | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23191327.8 | 12.10.2020 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | US201962916789P | 17.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962916789 P | US202017023854 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: US202017023854 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4274350 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4274350 | Date: | 17.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W74/006 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W74/0808 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/33] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KANALBELEGUNGSSTRUKTURANZEIGE IM ZEITBEREICH | [2023/45] | English: | CHANNEL OCCUPANCY STRUCTURE INDICATION IN THE TIME DOMAIN | [2023/45] | French: | INDICATION DE STRUCTURE D'OCCUPATION DE CANAL DANS LE DOMAINE TEMPOREL | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20201297.7 / EP3809785 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |