EP4292588 - ADMINISTRATION OF DEUTERATED CFTR POTENTIATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals (Europe) Limited 86-88 Jubilee Avenue Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4RW / GB | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAMAN, Virginia Winchester, MA 01890 / US | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 23191452.4 | 21.09.2016 | [2023/51] | Priority number, date | US201562221531P | 21.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562221531 P | US201562238511P | 07.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562238511 P | US201662348855P | 10.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662348855 P | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4292588 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4292588 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, C07D215/56, A61K9/14, A61K9/20, A61P11/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/47 (EP,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/145 (EP,IL);
A61K9/146 (EP,IL);
A61K9/16 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/20 (IL,KR,US);
A61K9/2009 (EP,IL);
A61K9/2013 (EP,IL);
A61K9/2018 (EP,IL);
A61K9/2054 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61P11/12 (RU);
C07D215/56 (EP,IL,RU,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | A61K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2023/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON DEUTERIERTEN CFTR-POTENZIATOREN | [2023/51] | English: | ADMINISTRATION OF DEUTERATED CFTR POTENTIATORS | [2023/51] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS DE POTENTIALISATION DE CFTR MODIFIÉS AU DEUTÉRIUM | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 14.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16849524.0 / EP3352757 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011288122 (VAN GOOR FREDRICK F [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 8-10 * * paragraph [0343] *; | [A]US2014221424 (ZHA JIUHONG [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2015099780 (MORGAN ADAM J [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 28] - [0037] * * paragraph [0120]; table 1 * * examples 6,7 *; | [XPI] - UTTAMSINEH V ET AL, "WS13.6 CTP-656 tablet confirmed superiority of pharmacokinetic profile relative to Kalydeco in Phase I clinical studies", JOURNAL OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS, (20160601), vol. 15, doi:10.1016/S1569-1993(16)30138-2, ISSN 1569-1993, XP029572015 [XP] 1-3,5-7,9-12,14-16 * Abstract WS13.6 * [I] 4,8,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1569-1993(16)30138-2 | by applicant | US7014866 | US2006079502 | US2006094744 | US8754224 | US8865902 | US8883206 | - KEMPF, D.J et al., Antimicrobial agents and chemotherapy, (19970000), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 654 - 60 | - WANG, L et al., Clinical Pharmacology and Therapeutics, (19940000), vol. 56, no. 6, pages 659 - 67 | - BLAKE, MI et al., J Pharm Sci, (19750000), vol. 64, pages 367 - 91 | - FOSTER, AB, Adv Drug Res, (19850000), pages 1 - 40 | - KUSHNER, DJ et al., Can J Physiol Pharmacol, (19990000), pages 79 - 88 | - FISHER, MB et al., Curr Opin Drug Discov Devel, (20060000), vol. 9, pages 101 - 09 | - FUKUTO et al., J. Med. Chem., (19910000), vol. 34, pages 2871 - 76 | - FREIREICH et al., Cancer Chemother. Rep, (19660000), vol. 50, page 219 | - "Scientific Tables", Geigy Pharmaceuticals, Ardsley, (19700000), vol. 537 | - WADA, E et al., Seikagaku, (19940000), vol. 66, page 15 | - GANNES, LZ et al., Comp Biochem Physiol Mol Integr Physiol, (19980000), vol. 119, page 725 |