EP4327698 - CHAIR WITH A LOCKABLE HINGE ASSEMBLY AND HINGE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | 02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interstuhl Büromöbel GmbH & Co. KG Brühlstrasse 21 72469 Messstetten / DE | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Link, Joachim 72469 Meßstetten / DE | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23191873.1 | 17.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | DE202210121321 | 23.08.2022 Original published format: DE102022121321 | [2024/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4327698 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A47C1/032, A47C3/025, A47C3/026 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A47C3/026 (EP);
A47C7/58 (CN);
A47C1/03255 (EP);
A47C1/03288 (EP);
A47C3/0252 (EP);
A47C7/002 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUHL MIT EINER BLOCKIERBAREN GELENKANORDNUNG UND GELENKANORDNUNG | [2024/09] | English: | CHAIR WITH A LOCKABLE HINGE ASSEMBLY AND HINGE ASSEMBLY | [2024/09] | French: | CHAISE AVEC UN ENSEMBLE D'ARTICULATION VERROUILLABLE ET ENSEMBLE D'ARTICULATION | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/36] | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013033078 (BOCK HERMANN [DE]); | [X]US2017231394 (BRUESKE JOACHIM [DE]); | [X]DE102020101033 (BOCK 1 GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | EP1584266 | DE102018123414 |