Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
02.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
02.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
18.08.2023 | Change - representative |