Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023126854 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | US202016634185 | 27.01.2020 | US202218087851 | 23.12.2022 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11559936 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2023 | B2 | US2020384680 | 10.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | US201816634185 | 27.07.2018 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7549084B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2024 | B2 | JP2023116659 | 22.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | JP2020504413 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7348162B | Global Dossier | 20.09.2023 | B2 | JP2020528374 | 24.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL312935 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL272317 | Global Dossier | 01.06.2024 | B1 | IL272317 | 31.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3658352 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2023 | B1 | EP3658352 | 03.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111051043B | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B | CN111051043 | 21.04.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4254387 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | A3 | EP4254387 | 04.10.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | EP18758746 | 27.07.2018 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3658352T | 02.01.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2967291T | 29.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | WO2018IL50842 | 27.07.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019021294 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762538003 | 28.07.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3658352 |