EP4254387 - ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESSES EMPLOYING A MATERIAL FEATURING PROPERTIES OF A SOFT BODILY TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stratasys Ltd. 1 Holtzman Street Science Park P.O. Box 2496 7612401 Rehovot / IL | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIKOVSKY, Daniel 4076717 Ariel / IL | 02 /
HIRSCH, Shai 7630521 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
AMIEL-LEVY, Mazi 4956805 Petach-Tikva / IL | 04 /
FEFFER, Amit 4637945 Herzliya / IL | 05 /
LUPO, Shiran 2067116 Yokneam Ilit / IL | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Calysta NV Lambroekstraat 5a 1831 Diegem / BE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 23191995.2 | 27.07.2018 | [2023/40] | Priority number, date | US201762538003P | 28.07.2017 Original published format: US 201762538003 P | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4254387 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4254387 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/112, B33Y10/00, B33Y70/00, G09B23/28, G09B23/30, G03F7/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/027, G03F7/075, G03F7/105, // B29C64/194 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
B29C64/112 (EP,IL,US);
B29C64/194 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,IL,US);
B33Y80/00 (IL,US);
G03F7/0037 (EP,IL);
G03F7/0047 (EP,IL);
G03F7/027 (EP,IL);
G03F7/0752 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2023/40] | G09B23/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES MATERIALS MIT EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES WEICHEN KÖRPERGEWEBES | [2023/40] | English: | ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING PROCESSES EMPLOYING A MATERIAL FEATURING PROPERTIES OF A SOFT BODILY TISSUE | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE UTILISANT UN MATÉRIAU PRÉSENTANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS D'UN TISSU CORPOREL MOU | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 15.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18758746.4 / EP3658352 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2780154 (STRATASYS LTD [IL]); | [A]WO2015107333 (KING S COLLEGE LONDON [GB], et al); | [XA]US2016009029 (COHEN ADAM [US], et al); | [A]WO2016179242 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US]); | [A]US2017190859 (LIU XIPENG [US], et al) | by applicant | US6259962 | US6569373 | US6658314 | US6850334 | US7183335 | US7209797 | US7225045 | US7300619 | US7479510 | US7500846 | US2010191360 | US7962237 | US9031680 | US9227365 | WO2017208238 |