EP4290856 - PORTABLE DIGITAL VIDEO CAMERA CONFIGURED FOR REMOTE IMAGE ACQUISITION CONTROL AND VIEWING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contour IP Holding, LLC 26 Patriot Place, Ste 301 Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'DONNELL, Laura Hermosa Beach, 90254 / US | 02 /
MANDER, Richard Bainbridge, 98110 / US | 03 /
DENTON, Michael 8140 Christchurch / NZ | 04 /
BODLEY, Ben 8140 Christchurch / NZ | 05 /
TOMPKINS, Alan Ferny Grove, 4055 / AU | 06 /
GURGANUS, Keith Leucadia, 92024 / US | 07 /
BARNSDALE, Kelvin P. 8051 Christchurch / NZ | 08 /
THIRD, Simon 8140 Christchurch / NZ | 09 /
PIERCE, Carm Stanwood, 98292 / US | 10 /
PERKINS, Carl Seattle, 98133 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Schulz, Oliver Frank Michael df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23192280.8 | 13.09.2011 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | US201038240410P | 13.09.2010 Original published format: US 38240410 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4290856 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4290856 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00, G03B17/38, H04N7/18, H04M1/725 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04N23/661 (EP,US);
G01S19/42 (US);
G08B13/19641 (US);
G08B13/1966 (US);
G08B13/19682 (US);
G08B13/19684 (US);
G16H40/67 (US);
H04N21/21805 (US);
H04N21/234363 (US);
H04N21/2365 (US);
H04N21/2385 (US);
H04N21/25825 (US);
H04N21/2662 (US);
H04N21/4621 (US);
H04N23/50 (US);
H04N23/51 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/617 (US);
H04N23/66 (EP,US);
H04N5/28 (US);
H04N5/76 (EP);
H04N7/18 (US);
H04N7/181 (US);
H04N7/183 (US);
H04N7/185 (EP,US);
G01S19/19 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRAGBARE DIGITALE VIDEOKAMERA ZUR STEUERUNG UND ANZEIGE VON FERNBILDAUFNAHMEN | [2023/50] | English: | PORTABLE DIGITAL VIDEO CAMERA CONFIGURED FOR REMOTE IMAGE ACQUISITION CONTROL AND VIEWING | [2023/50] | French: | CAMÉRA VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUE PORTABLE CONFIGURÉE POUR LA COMMANDE D'ACQUISITION ET LA VISUALISATION D'IMAGES À DISTANCE | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 20.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 20.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11825800.3 / EP2617186 | EP21206052.9 / EP4007270 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JP2004080256 (CANON KK) [I] 1,5-10 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0072] * [Y] 2-4,11-13; | [A]US2005231599 (YAMASAKI MASAFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0124] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0177] - paragraph [0202] * * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0214] * * paragraph [0257] ** paragraph [0261] *; | [Y]US2007035612 (KORNELUK JOSE E [US], et al) [Y] 11-13 * paragraph [0056] *; | [Y]WO2010054245 (LOOXCIE INC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0046] *; | [Y] - VAN BEEK P ET AL, "Adaptive streaming of high-quality video over wireless LANs", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, IEEE, US, (20040120), vol. 5308, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.527629, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 647 - 660, XP002312522 [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.527629 |