EP4258200 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING CREDIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fomukong, Mundi 269 South Beverly Dr., 951 Beverly Hills, CA 90212 / US | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Hansson Thyresson AB PO Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 23192860.7 | 18.03.2015 | [2023/41] | Priority number, date | US201414244865 | 03.04.2014 Original published format: US201414244865 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4258200 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4258200 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00, G06Q40/02, G06Q20/32, G06Q20/40, G06Q40/03 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3224 (EP,US);
G06Q40/03 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3265 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | G06Q40/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2023/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERHALTEN EINES KREDITS | [2023/41] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OBTAINING CREDIT | [2023/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'OBTENTION DE CRÉDIT | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 21.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15773102.7 / EP3127078 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008162316 (RAMPELL ALASTAIR [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract ** paragraphs [0083] - [0510] *; | [I]US2009070263 (DAVIS MARTIN [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0072] *; | [XI]EP2388744 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0008] - [0038] * [I] 1-12; | [I]US2012030110 (PRAKASH GYAN [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0060] *; | [I]US8655773 (FASOLI JONATHAN DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 15, line 21 * |