EP4309885 - A DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION OF EMPTIED CONTAINERS FOR RECYCLING PURPOSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tomra Systems ASA Drengsrudhagen 2 1385 Asker / NO | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENTER, Holger 72336 Balingen-Heselwangen / DE | 02 /
VÖLKLE, Thomas 72348 Osenfeld-Täbingen / DE | 03 /
FRAURUD, Marius 0583 Oslo / NO | 04 /
HOVDE, Kristian 0583 Oslo / NO | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 23193417.5 | 31.01.2020 | [2024/04] | Priority number, date | EP20190154899 | 31.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19154899 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4309885 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4309885 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/32, B02C18/14, B02C18/18, B02C19/00, B30B9/30 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B30B9/325 (EP,US);
B30B3/005 (US);
B30B3/04 (US);
B02C19/0093 (EP);
B30B9/301 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/04] | B30B9/32, B02C18/14, B02C18/18, B02C19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERDICHTEN VON ENTLEERTEN BEHÄLTERN FÜR RECYCLINGZWECKE | [2024/04] | English: | A DEVICE FOR COMPRESSION OF EMPTIED CONTAINERS FOR RECYCLING PURPOSES | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION DE RÉCIPIENTS VIDÉS À DES FINS DE RECYCLAGE | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 12.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20702128.8 / EP3917766 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS4928255U ; | [A]US4252282 (VERMEULEN ERIC, et al); | [A]JP3025701U ; | [A]WO2017140863 (TOMRA SYSTEMS ASA [NO]); | [A]WO2018167060 (SCHWELLING HERMANN [DE]) | by applicant | JPS4928255U | US4252282 | JP3025701U | US2014196616 | EP2756946 |