EP4357249 - METHOD AND AIRCRAFT HAVING AT LEAST ONE COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A DRIVE SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST TWO ELECTRIC MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Helicopters Aéroport International Marseille Provence 13725 Marignane Cedex / FR | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAZZINO, Marc 13012 MARSEILLE / FR | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | GPI Brevets 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23194149.3 | 30.08.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | FR20220010750 | 18.10.2022 Original published format: FR 2210750 | [2024/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357249 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B64D31/18, B64D35/023, B64D33/00, B64D27/10, B64D31/02, F02C7/262, F02C7/275, F02K5/00, // B64D27/04, B64C27/06, B64D35/08 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
B64D33/00 (EP);
B64D27/02 (CN);
F02C9/00 (US);
B64D27/10 (EP);
B64D31/02 (EP);
B64D31/18 (EP);
B64D35/023 (EP);
F02C6/206 (US);
F02C7/262 (EP);
F02C7/275 (EP);
F02K5/00 (EP);
H02P9/08 (US);
B64C27/06 (EP);
B64D27/04 (EP);
B64D35/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/17] | B64D33/00, B64D27/10, B64D31/02, F02C7/268, F02C7/262, F02C7/275, F02K5/00, // B64D27/04, B64C27/06, B64D35/08, F02C6/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2024/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FLUGZEUG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND EINEM ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MIT MINDESTENS ZWEI ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINEN | [2024/17] | English: | METHOD AND AIRCRAFT HAVING AT LEAST ONE COMBUSTION ENGINE AND A DRIVE SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST TWO ELECTRIC MACHINES | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET AÉRONEF MUNI D'AU MOINS UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION ET D'UN SYSTÈME D'ENTRAINEMENT À AU MOINS DEUX MACHINES ÉLECTRIQUES | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 26.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2404775 (EUROCOPTER FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP3209563 (SAFRAN HELICOPTER ENGINES [FR]); | [A]US2019264615 (HUSBAND STEPHEN M [GB], et al) | by applicant | EP2404775 | FR2967133 | FR3019215 | EP3209563 | US2019264615 |