EP4332569 - THERMAL ANALYSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigaku Corporation 3-9-12, Matsubara-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-8666 / JP | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORITAKE, Koichiro Tokyo, 196-8666 / JP | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Lambacher, Michael, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 3 81541 München / DE | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 23194215.2 | 30.08.2023 | [2024/10] | Priority number, date | JP20220139845 | 02.09.2022 Original published format: JP 2022139845 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332569 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/0021 (EP);
G01N25/20 (CN);
G01N7/16 (US);
G01N1/00 (CN);
G01N1/22 (CN);
G01N1/24 (CN);
G01N1/28 (CN);
G01N1/44 (CN);
G01N25/00 (CN);
G01N25/02 (CN);
G01N33/0004 (CN);
G01N33/0006 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/41] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR THERMISCHEN ANALYSE | [2024/10] | English: | THERMAL ANALYSIS APPARATUS | [2024/10] | French: | APPAREIL D'ANALYSE THERMIQUE | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/41] | 04.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1439469 (BAYER AG); | [I]EP3438659 (HORIBA LTD [JP]) | by applicant | JP2011232108 |