EP4287726 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND BASE STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei Guangdong / CN | 02 /
WANG, Fan Guangdong / CN | 03 /
LIANG, Minchao Guangdong / CN | 04 /
YU, Jinqing Guangdong / CN | 05 /
ZHANG, He Guangdong / CN | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23194260.8 | 21.12.2017 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | CN201611195848 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: CN201611195848 | [2023/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4287726 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4287726 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/08, H04L25/00, H04L25/02, H04B1/00, H04W24/02, H04W28/02, H04W28/16, H04W52/02, H04W56/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04L25/02 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN);
G06F9/5011 (US);
G06F1/10 (US);
H04B1/0003 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W28/0236 (CN);
H04W28/16 (EP,CN);
H04W52/02 (EP);
H04W52/0261 (CN);
H04W56/00 (EP);
H04W56/001 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | H04W56/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2023/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND BASISSTATION | [2023/49] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS AND BASE STATION | [2023/49] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET STATION DE BASE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17884615.0 / EP3562262 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2472995 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2016197991 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-14* the whole document * |