EP4275486 - ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Sangwon 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Park, Jaehoon 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/46] | Mooser, Sebastian Thomas Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23195112.0 | 10.07.2020 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | KR20190144267 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: KR 20190144267 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4275486 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4275486 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/48, // G10L15/28, G10L15/22, B67D1/08 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
G10L25/48 (EP);
G06F3/167 (KR);
G06F3/162 (CN);
G10L15/26 (US);
A47J31/46 (CN);
A47J31/52 (CN);
A47J31/525 (CN);
B67D1/0008 (US);
B67D1/0888 (EP,KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G10L15/05 (US);
G10L15/063 (US);
G10L15/14 (KR);
G10L15/16 (US);
G10L15/18 (KR);
G10L15/22 (CN);
G10L17/18 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | A01K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR KÜNSTLICHE INTELLIGENZ | [2023/46] | English: | ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE APPARATUS | [2023/46] | French: | APPAREIL D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE | [2023/46] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20185202.7 / EP3822972 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015336786 (GARDNER WILLIAM EVERETTE [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 4-5 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0053] , [0055] , [0070] , [0072] , [0073] , [0074] - [0076] *; | [A]WO2018199421 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0134] - [0144] *; | [A]KR20190092327 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,2 ** paragraphs [0093] , [0105] * |