EP4357112 - ULTRASONIC WELDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GDM S.p.A. Via Battindarno, 91 40133 Bologna / IT | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIANTONI, Matteo 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | 02 /
ZAVALLONI, Alessandro 40133 Bologna (BO) / IT | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Porta & Consulenti Associati S.p.A. Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23195166.6 | 04.09.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | IT20220021480 | 18.10.2022 Original published format: IT202200021480 | [2024/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357112 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, // A61F13/15, B29L31/48 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B29C65/7885 (EP);
B29C66/9511 (EP,US);
A61F13/15707 (EP);
B29C65/08 (US);
B29C65/087 (EP);
B29C65/7894 (EP);
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C66/431 (EP);
B29C66/81465 (EP);
B29C66/83511 (EP);
B29C66/8748 (EP);
A61F2013/15861 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/8322 (EP);
B29C66/8324 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2001/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2033/08 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/003 (EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/046 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSCHWEISSSYSTEM | [2024/17] | English: | ULTRASONIC WELDING SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOUDAGE PAR ULTRASONS | [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2020165749 (GDM SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-13 * page 15, line 28 - page 16, line 4; figures 1-6,10 ** page 16, lines 8-10 * | by applicant | WO2020165749 |