EP4282475 - A PYRAZOLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KULCZAR, Christopher, D Rahway, 07065 / US | 02 /
WANG, Chen-Chao Rahway, 07065-0900 / US | 03 /
FUNG, Michelle, H Rahway, 07065 / US | 04 /
BROWN, Chad, D Rahway, 07065 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Intervet International B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 23195988.3 | 18.12.2020 | [2023/48] | Priority number, date | US201962951185P | 20.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962951185 P | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4282475 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4282475 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K47/34, A61K47/38, A61K31/4155, A61P17/00 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/1641 (EP,KR);
A61K9/1617 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (KR,US);
A61K31/4155 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K47/38 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (KR);
A61K9/2013 (KR,US);
A61K9/2031 (KR,US);
A61K9/2054 (KR,US);
A61K9/2059 (US);
A61K9/2095 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE PYRAZOLZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2023/48] | English: | A PYRAZOLE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION | [2023/48] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À BASE DE PYRAZOLE | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 28.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20841906.9 / EP4076404 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9808490 (PHARMOS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1 * claims 1-20 * [A] 2-15; | [YA]WO2006039268 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1 * claims 1-19 *[A] 2-15; | [YDA]WO2018108969 (INTERVET INT BV [NL], et al) [YD] 1 * claims 1-18 * [A] 2-15 | by applicant | WO2013041042 | WO2018108969 | - RAHMAN et al., Inflammation & Allergy-drug target, (20110000), vol. 10, pages 486 - 496 | - HARSKAMP et al., Seminar in Cutaneous Medicine and Surgery, (20130000), vol. 32, pages 132 - 139 | - NUTTALL et al., Veterinary Records, (20130000), vol. 172, no. 8, pages 201 - 207 | - HILL, P.B.LAU, P.RYBNICEK, J., "Development of an owner-assessed scale to measure the severity of pruritus in dogs", Vet. Dermatol., (20070000), vol. 18, pages 301 - 308 |