EP4266710 - LOCATION DATA HARVESTING AND PRUNING FOR WIRELESS ACCESSORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Driscoll, Adam Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Erdmann, Ernst Thomas Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Lalande, Emmanuel Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Laster, Michael C. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
Lopatin, Scott Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
Mayor, Robert W. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
Movva, Siva Ganesh Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
Rochette, Tommy Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 09 /
Selle, Christina Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 10 /
Wasada, Langford M. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 11 /
Poonia, Munish K. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 12 /
Pai, Raghunandan K. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 13 /
Ledvina, Brent M. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 14 /
Bhattacharya, Swadesh Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 15 /
Brogle, Kyle C. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 16 /
Ertan, Tunc Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 17 /
Freudiger, Julien F. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 18 /
Hariharan, Sriram Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 19 /
Paulin, Mads N. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 20 /
Schaevitz, Samuel B. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 21 /
Schoenberg, Jonathan R. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 22 /
Shourounis, Nicholas D. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 23 /
Sierra, Yannick L. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/52] |
Former [2023/50] | 01 /
DRISCOLL, Adam Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
ERDMANN, Ernst Thomas Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
03 /
LALANDE, Emmanuel Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
04 /
LASTER, Michael C. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
05 /
LOPATIN, Scott Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
06 /
MAYOR, Robert W. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
07 /
MOVVA, Siva Ganesh Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
08 /
ROCHETTE, Tommy Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
09 /
SELLE, Christina Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | |||
10 /
WASADA, Langford M. Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 23196053.5 | 15.04.2020 | [2023/43] | Priority number, date | US201962835494P | 17.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962835494 P | US201962855975P | 01.06.2019 Original published format: US 201962855975 P | US201962897789P | 09.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962897789 P | [2023/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266710 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/029, H04W12/00, H04W12/04, H04W12/08, H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04W52/00, H04W52/02 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04W4/029 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/023 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/20 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/0254 (EP,CN,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | GEWINNUNG UND PRUNING VON STANDORTDATEN FÜR DRAHTLOSE ZUBEHÖRGERÄTE | [2023/43] | English: | LOCATION DATA HARVESTING AND PRUNING FOR WIRELESS ACCESSORY DEVICES | [2023/43] | French: | COLLECTE ET ÉLAGAGE DE DONNÉES DE LOCALISATION POUR DISPOSITIFS ACCESSOIRES SANS FIL | [2023/43] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20724978.0 / EP3957090 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016069991 (DAS SAUMITRA MOHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0036] *; | [XI]US2017127340 (DOOLEY CRAIG P [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11,12 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0063] * [I] 6-10; | [XI]US2017228935 (FOSTER JAMES H [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] * [I] 5-10 |