EP4324709 - AIRCRAFT BRAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | For all designated states AIRBUS OPERATIONS (S.A.S) 316, route de Bayonne 31060 Toulouse / FR | For all designated states Airbus S.A.S. 2, rond-point Emile Dewoitine 31700 Blagnac / FR | [2024/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILL, Mr. Andrew Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | 02 /
OZA, Ustav Bristol, BS34 7QW / GB | 03 /
RAMIREZ-PAYA, Esther Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | 04 /
CLARKE, Mr. David Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | [2024/08] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2024/08] | Application number, filing date | 23196672.2 | 27.02.2019 | [2024/08] | Priority number, date | GB20180003203 | 27.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201803203 | GB20180011179 | 06.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201811179 | [2024/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4324709 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4324709 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/22, B60T8/17, B60T8/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B60T17/221 (EP,GB,US);
B64F5/60 (CN,US);
B60T17/22 (EP);
B60T8/1703 (EP,GB,US);
B60T8/171 (US);
B60T8/32 (US);
B60T8/325 (EP);
B60T8/58 (US);
B64C25/42 (EP,CN,US);
B64C25/426 (US);
F16D55/36 (EP,GB);
F16D66/00 (US);
F16D66/02 (GB);
F16D66/021 (US);
B60T13/662 (EP);
B60T2270/406 (EP,US);
F16D2066/001 (EP,US);
F16D2066/006 (US);
F16D2200/0052 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/08] | B60T8/17 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FLUGZEUGBREMSUNG | [2024/08] | English: | AIRCRAFT BRAKING | [2024/08] | French: | FREINAGE POUR AÉRONEF | [2024/08] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 06.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19159658.4 / EP3530533 | EP21201967.3 / EP3957528 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2305775 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [A] 1-11* page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 28; figures 4,7-9 *; | [A]EP0384071 (AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 9, lines 36-45; figure 1 *; | [A]US5390990 (COOK ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3, lines 16-48; figure 2 *; | [A]US5845975 (WELLS TREVOR CHARLES [GB]) [A] 1-11 * column 6, lines 5-12; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008097260 (BOEING CO [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * pages 3-10; figure 1- *; | [A]US2015203194 (GRIFFITH THOMAS TODD [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0050] - [0054]; figures 2,5 *; | [A]EP3088266 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0039] , [0057]; figures 1-4c * | by applicant | FR2305775 | GB20180003203 |