EP4344961 - BUMPER FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stellantis Auto SAS 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, HONGRI SHANGHAI, 200233 / CN | 02 /
WANG, ZI YE Shanghai, 200233 / CN | 03 /
LEI, YUANFA Shanghai, 200233 / CN | 04 /
YANG, YIYUAN Shanghai, 200233 / CN | 05 /
FAN, XINYU Shanghai, 200233 / CN | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23197279.5 | 13.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | CN202211188759 | 28.09.2022 Original published format: CN202211188759 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344961 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18, B60R19/24 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B60R19/24 (EP);
B60R19/02 (CN);
B60R19/023 (CN);
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R2019/1886 (EP);
B60R2019/247 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOSSFÄNGER FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG UND FAHRZEUG DAMIT | [2024/14] | English: | BUMPER FOR VEHICLE AND VEHICLE COMPRISING THE SAME | [2024/14] | French: | PARE-CHOCS POUR VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE LE COMPRENANT | [2024/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2016052472 (RIESER WOLFGANG [DE]); | [XA]US2021213898 (SHIOGAI RYO [JP], et al); | [E]WO2023214136 (PSA AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) |