EP4268759 - SYSTEM OF PERFORMING SPINE SURGERY AND MAINTAINING A VOLUME OF FLUID AT A SURGICAL SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stryker Corporation 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2023/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALEN, James G. Portage, MI, 49024 / US | 02 /
CARUSILLO, Steven J. Kalamazoo, MI, 49004 / US | [2024/34] |
Former [2023/44] | 01 /
WALEN, James, G. Portage, MI, 49024 / US | ||
02 /
CARUSILLO, Steven, J. Kalamazoo, MI, 49004 / US | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/44] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 23197288.6 | 23.10.2019 | [2023/44] | Priority number, date | US201862751964P | 29.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862751964 P | [2023/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4268759 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4268759 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61M1/00, A61B90/98, A61B17/14, A61B17/16, A61B17/32, A61B17/34, // A61B17/00, A61B34/20, A61B90/00 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
A61B17/0218 (EP,US);
A61B17/025 (US);
A61B17/3421 (EP);
A61B90/06 (US);
A61B90/98 (EP);
A61B17/14 (EP);
A61B17/1659 (EP);
A61B17/1671 (EP);
A61B17/32002 (EP);
A61B2017/00022 (EP);
A61B2017/00026 (US);
A61B2017/00261 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0256 (US);
A61B2017/1602 (EP);
A61B2017/1651 (EP);
A61B2017/3445 (EP);
A61B2034/2048 (EP);
A61B2090/061 (EP);
A61B2090/064 (EP);
A61B2090/067 (EP);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (US);
A61B90/361 (EP);
A61M1/77 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | A61B17/02, A61M1/00, A61B90/98, // A61B17/00, A61B34/20, A61B90/00 | ||
Former IPC [2023/44] | A61B90/98 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2023/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON WIRBELSÄULENOPERATIONEN UND AUFRECHTERHALTUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSVOLUMENS AN EINER OPERATIONSSTELLE | [2024/34] | English: | SYSTEM OF PERFORMING SPINE SURGERY AND MAINTAINING A VOLUME OF FLUID AT A SURGICAL SITE | [2023/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RÉALISATION D'UNE CHIRURGIE DE LA COLONNE VERTÉBRALE ET DE MAINTIEN D'UN VOLUME DE FLUIDE AU NIVEAU D'UN SITE CHIRURGICAL | [2024/34] |
Former [2023/44] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON WIRBELSÄULENOPERATIONEN UND AUFRECHTERHALTUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSVOLUMENS AN EINER OPERATIONSSTELLE | ||
Former [2023/44] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE RÉALISATION D'UNE CHIRURGIE DE LA COLONNE VERTÉBRALE ET DE MAINTIEN D'UN VOLUME DE FLUIDE AU NIVEAU D'UN SITE CHIRURGICAL | Examination procedure | 31.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 31.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19804926.4 / EP3873351 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1781353 (KUMAR ATUL [IN], et al); | [A]EP1796530 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US]); | [XAI]US2014303551 (GERMAIN AARON [US], et al); | [A]US2015238682 (TERANUMA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6152941 | US6689146 | US7238010 | US7621898 | US7717931 | US8216199 | US8475481 | US8657809 | US2014135617 | US8740866 | US8915897 | WO2016054140 | US9579428 | WO2017139304 | US9901407 |