EP4344942 - SEAT RAIL LOCKING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Transys Inc. 105, Sindang 1-ro Seongyeon-myeon Seosan-si Chungcheongnam-do 31930 / KR | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Cheon 18483 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
SEO, Kyeong Ho 16523 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LIM, Heoung Su 18475 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
HWANG, Seong Jun 18482 Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23197395.9 | 14.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | KR20220124400 | 29.09.2022 Original published format: KR 20220124400 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344942 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/07, B60N2/08 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B60N2/0705 (EP);
B60N2/0806 (KR,US);
B60N2/0715 (EP);
B60N2/0727 (KR);
B60N2/0818 (EP,US);
B60N2/0875 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2024/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZSCHIENENVERRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2024/14] | English: | SEAT RAIL LOCKING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2024/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE RAIL DE SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULE | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 14.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3042379 (HAMMERSTEIN GMBH C ROB [DE]); | [XY]FR2759330 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]); | [XY]DE10041605 (KEIPER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [XY]DE102008056683 (KEIPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |