EP4360828 - LOGISTICS ROBOTIC SYSTEM WITH ADJUSTABLE MULTI-ZONE END EFFECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 23.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligrated Headquarters LLC 7901 Innovation Way Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REST, Adam Ming Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 23197997.2 | 18.09.2023 | [2024/18] | Priority number, date | US202218049575 | 25.10.2022 Original published format: US202218049575 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4360828 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/00, B25J15/06 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B25J15/0052 (EP,US);
B25J9/00 (CN);
B25J13/089 (US);
B25J15/0014 (EP);
B25J15/0616 (EP,US);
B25J19/00 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LOGISTIKROBOTERSYSTEM MIT EINSTELLBAREM MEHRZONIGEM ENDEFFEKTOR | [2024/18] | English: | LOGISTICS ROBOTIC SYSTEM WITH ADJUSTABLE MULTI-ZONE END EFFECTOR | [2024/18] | French: | SYSTÈME ROBOTIQUE LOGISTIQUE AVEC EFFECTEUR TERMINAL MULTIZONE RÉGLABLE | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 20.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10029374 (MCCOLLUM JOSHUA [US], et al); | [A]WO2019097442 (SIMAC TECH S R L [IT]); | [XI]IT201800010184 (NEABOTICS S R L [IT]); | [XI]KR20210152649 (KRRI [KR]); | [I]EP4011570 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) |