EP4345487 - POSITIONING REFERENCE UNIT SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHALOPOULOS, Diomidis Munich / DE | 02 /
KUCERA, Stepan Munich / DE | 03 /
SAHIN, Taylan Munich / DE | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23198104.4 | 19.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | FI20220005838 | 27.09.2022 Original published format: FI 20225838 | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4345487 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, H04W4/02, G01S5/00, // H04W64/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G01S5/0236 (EP);
H04W76/27 (US);
G01S5/0009 (EP);
G01S5/021 (EP);
G01S5/0268 (US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W72/25 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHL EINER POSITIONIERUNGSREFERENZEINHEIT | [2024/14] | English: | POSITIONING REFERENCE UNIT SELECTION | [2024/14] | French: | SÉLECTION D'UNITÉ DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2021063248 (FG INNOVATION CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN113330786 (FRAUNHOFER GES ZUR FORDERUNGDER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E V); | [A]WO2022154861 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO2022184227 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); |