EP4340562 - HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE, ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SUCH A HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Holdings 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen-sur-Seine / FR | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUDEMAR, Christophe 65310 Horgues / FR | 02 /
COLLET, Andrea 64320 Lee / FR | 03 /
DAGUIN, Yann 65310 Horgues / FR | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 23198165.5 | 19.09.2023 | [2024/12] | Priority number, date | FR20220009428 | 19.09.2022 Original published format: FR 2209428 | [2024/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4340562 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
H05K7/20254 (EP);
H05K7/20927 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2024/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG, ANORDNUNG MIT SOLCH EINER WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/12] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE, ASSEMBLY COMPRISING SUCH A HEAT EXCHANGE DEVICE AND ASSOCIATED MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2024/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANGE THERMIQUE, ENSEMBLE COMPRENANT UN TEL DISPOSITIF D'ÉCHANGE THERMIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉS | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1564809 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9* figures 1,10 *; | [YA]EP2610908 (SANOH IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,14; | [XY]US2019171258 (RICE DAVID PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraphs [0092] - [0099]; figures 2,4a-4c * [Y] 4-7,10; | [YA]US2019373772 (MAYBERRY TRAVIS L [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] - [0059] - [0063]; figures 4-12 * [A] 1,8,9,11; | [Y]KR20220068647 (SUNG WOO HITECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0043] , [0046]; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]WO2022157727 (KORAL TECH S R L [IT]) [Y] 5-7 * page 1, lines 1-6 * * page 6 - page 7 * * page 10, line 24 - page 12, line 3 * * page 18, paragraph 2; figures 1-3,14-17,19,21 * [A] 1,14 |