EP4342745 - LID, CLOSED BOX BODY, TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR USE IN WIPER, AND WIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.10.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Automotive Products (Changsha) Co., Ltd. No. 26, Lixiang Road Middle Xingsha Changsha Hunan 410100 / CN | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Chunfu Changsha, Hunan Province, 410100 / CN | 02 /
QIN, Zonglian Changsha, Hunan Province, 410100 / CN | 03 /
Dai, Yu Changsha, Hunan Province, 410100 / CN | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/13] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPA P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 23198422.0 | 20.09.2023 | [2024/13] | Priority number, date | CN202211141429 | 20.09.2022 Original published format: CN202211141429 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342745 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/04, H02K5/10, F16H57/029, // H02K7/116, H05K5/03 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H02K5/10 (EP);
F16H57/031 (EP);
H05K5/0213 (EP);
B60S1/166 (EP);
F16H57/029 (EP);
H02K2205/09 (EP);
H02K7/1166 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/45] |
Former [2024/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DECKEL, GESCHLOSSENER KOFFERKÖRPER, GETRIEBEEINHEIT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM SCHEIBENWISCHER UND SCHEIBENWISCHER | [2024/13] | English: | LID, CLOSED BOX BODY, TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR USE IN WIPER, AND WIPER | [2024/13] | French: | COUVERCLE, CORPS DE BOÎTE FERMÉE, UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS UN ESSUIE-GLACE, ET ESSUIE-GLACE | [2024/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/45] | 27.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05319463 (RISO KAGAKU CORP) [A] 1* paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0967160 (ALCAN TECH & MAN AG [CH]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN215244741U (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE PROD CHANGSHA) [X] 1,5,10-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 26]; figures 1-4 * |