EP4357596 - METHOD OF STARTING A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place, 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donnelly, David M Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Turner, Caroline L Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 03 /
Wall, Derek S Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | 04 /
Douglas, Peter F Derby, DE24 8BJ / GB | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/17] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 23198690.2 | 21.09.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | GB20220015610 | 21.10.2022 Original published format: GB 202215610 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4357596 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4357596 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/26, F01D19/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
F02C7/26 (EP,GB,US);
F01D19/00 (EP,GB,US);
F02C6/00 (GB,US);
F02C9/28 (GB,US);
F05D2260/80 (EP);
F05D2260/85 (EP);
F05D2270/44 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINES GASTURBINENMOTORS | [2024/17] | English: | METHOD OF STARTING A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉMARRAGE D'UN MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ | [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012072194 (ARNOLD ROBERT WALTER [US], et al); | [X]US2016281607 (ASATI MAHESH KUMAR [US], et al) |