EP4342515 - IMPROVED ELECTROPORATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGEA S.p.A. Via Parmenide, 10/A 41012 Carpi (MO) / IT | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUSCO, Roberta 41012 CARPI (MO) / IT | 02 /
DE TERLIZZI, Francesca 41012 CARPI (MO) / IT | 03 /
CADOSSI, Ruggero 41012 CARPI (MO) / IT | 04 /
MARAZZI, Donata 41012 CARPI (MO) / IT | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 23199007.8 | 22.09.2023 | [2024/13] | Priority number, date | IT20220019635 | 23.09.2022 Original published format: IT202200019635 | [2024/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342515 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
A61N1/327 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE ELEKTROPORATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | IMPROVED ELECTROPORATION DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉLECTROPORATION AMÉLIORÉ | [2024/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7053063 (RUBINSKY BORIS [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019336757 (RODRIGUEZ JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2020061192 (VIRGINIA TECH INTELLECTUAL PROPERTIES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020197073 (SANO MICHAEL B [US], et al) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [A]US10814129 (JAROSZESKI MARK JEFFERY [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2021023362 (LORENZO MELVIN F [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2005065284 | US7053063 | US2019336757 | WO2020061192 | US2020197073 | US10814129 | US2021023362 |