EP4355053 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | 22.03.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Hyun Eok Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
KWON, Sung Joo Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
LEE, Ju Hyun Yongin-si / KR | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 23199236.3 | 22.09.2023 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | KR20220130094 | 11.10.2022 Original published format: KR 20220130094 | KR20220181159 | 21.12.2022 Original published format: KR 20220181159 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4355053 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H10K50/17, H10K59/122, H10K59/38, H10K59/80 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K59/80516 (US);
H10K50/17 (EP);
H10K59/1201 (US);
H10K59/38 (EP,US);
H10K59/873 (US);
H10K59/8731 (EP);
H10K59/8792 (EP,US);
H10K2102/341 (EP,US);
H10K59/35 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2024/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2024/16] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATING THE SAME | [2024/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/16] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005268024 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2008135325 (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD) [X] 1,5,7,8,11,13-15 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025]; figure 2; claims 1-10 * [Y] 2,3,12 [I] 9; | [Y]US2012205634 (IKEDA HISAO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3,12 * page 2, paragraph 26 *; | [XYI]US2022077251 (CHOUNG JI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,10,11,13,15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figure 1A; claims 1, 31-33 * * paragraph [0047] * [Y] 2,3,12 [I] 9 |