EP4280367 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMINE, Hirokazu Tokyo, 1000006 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA, Naoki Tokyo, 1000006 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Makoto Tokyo, 1000006 / JP | 04 /
ZHANG, Xun Tokyo, 1000006 / JP | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 23199312.2 | 11.09.2020 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | JP20190167451 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019167451 | JP20200124513 | 21.07.2020 Original published format: JP 2020124513 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4280367 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4280367 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M50/417, H01M50/423, H01M50/434, H01M50/44, H01M50/443, H01M50/449, H01M50/451, H01M50/454, H01M50/457, H01M50/489 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0569 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0568 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/417 (EP,KR);
H01M50/423 (EP,KR);
H01M50/434 (EP,KR);
H01M50/44 (EP,KR);
H01M50/443 (EP,KR);
H01M50/449 (EP);
H01M50/451 (EP,KR);
H01M50/454 (EP,KR);
H01M50/457 (EP);
H01M50/489 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0025 (US);
H01M2300/0028 (EP);
H01M2300/0037 (KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | H01M50/489 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/35] |
Former [2023/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NICHTWÄSSRIGE ELEKTROLYTLÖSUNG UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYTEN | [2023/47] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SOLUTION AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/47] | French: | SOLUTION ÉLECTROLYTIQUE NON-AQUEUSE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON-AQUEUX | [2023/47] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 24.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20862989.9 / EP3998657 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013177799 (IHARA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0184] * * paragraph [0203] - paragraph [0205] * * paragraph [0212] - paragraph [0215] * * examples 19.32-19.44; table 26 * * example 19.49; table 27 * * examples 22.32-22.44; table 31 * * example 22.49; table 32 ** claims 1, 8-10 *; | [AD]EP2772981 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117] * * table 6; compounds L2-L13, L16-L22 * * table 7; compounds S2-S27 * * table 8; compounds S28-S40, S43-S48 * * claims 1, 7-10, 14-18 *; | [A]US2016226106 (MINAMI KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * example 1 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * claims 1, 7 *; | [A]WO2018179884 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]WO2019031315 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [AP]US2020020987 (MORISAWA NAOYA [JP], et al) [AP] 1-17 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048] * * comparative examples 4, 5;; examples 1-9; table 1 * * claims 1, 4, 5, 10, 12 *; | [AP]EP3641043 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-17 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0172] - paragraph [0179] * * paragraph [0416] - paragraph [0421] * * paragraph [0423] - paragraph [0429] * * paragraph [0494] - paragraph [0496] * * comparative examples 4, 5;; examples 1-18; table 1 * * comparative examples 13-15;; examples 19-36; table 3 * * claims 1, 6, 7 * | by applicant | JPS3529854B | JPS3529858B | JP2019196306 | - The Chemistry of Organic Silicon Compounds, Wiley, (19980000), vol. 2 |