EP4273022 - STROLLER WITH A REVERSIBLE HANDLE AND UNLOCKING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wonderland Switzerland AG Beim Bahnhof 5 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2023/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Mingxing Dongguan, 523648 / CN | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 23199387.4 | 11.09.2020 | [2023/45] | Priority number, date | CN201910862582 | 11.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910862582 | [2023/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4273022 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62B9/20, // B62B5/06 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
B62B9/203 (EP,CN,US);
B62B9/12 (KR,US);
B62B9/20 (KR,US);
B60Y2200/83 (KR);
B62B2205/22 (EP);
B62B2206/003 (KR);
B62B5/064 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] |
Former [2023/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KINDERWAGEN MIT UMKEHRBAREM GRIFF UND ENTRIEGELUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2023/45] | English: | STROLLER WITH A REVERSIBLE HANDLE AND UNLOCKING MECHANISM | [2023/45] | French: | POUSSETTE AVEC POIGNÉE RÉVERSIBLE ET MÉCANISME DE DÉVERROUILLAGE | [2023/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 29.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20195654.7 / EP3792146 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60139671U ; | [A]EP0257588 (COMBI CO [JP]); | [A]JPH0384272U ; | [A]US5056805 (WANG CHIA-HO [TW]); | [A]JP2000159121 (APRICA KASSAI KK); | [A]US6116624 (HU STEPHEN [TW]); | [A]US6508605 (CHENG YING-HSIUNG [TW]); | [A]US2012326418 (OHNISHI ICHIRO [JP]) |