EP4328751 - MEMORY SYSTEM MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSIP Holdings LLC c/o Soros Fund Management LLC 250 West 55th Street New York, NY 10019 / US | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Jon, C. R. Sudbury, MA, 01776 / US | 02 /
BIEDERMAN, Daniel, C. San Jose, CA, 95123 / US | 03 /
SMITH, David, M. Union City, CA, 94587 / US | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23199455.9 | 06.06.2013 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | US201261656575P | 07.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261656575 P | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4328751 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4328751 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
G06F11/1092 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | SPEICHERSYSTEMVERWALTUNG | [2024/09] | English: | MEMORY SYSTEM MANAGEMENT | [2024/09] | French: | GESTION DE SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE | [2024/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13800543.4 / EP2859553 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IAY]US2003061441 (YAMAMOTO KOJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003188035 (LUBBERS CLARK [US], et al) | by applicant | US8200887 | US20100796836 | US20100901224 |