EP4371793 - MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ACTIVE DAMPING MECHANISM CONTROL METHOD, SYSTEM AND DAMPING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Gauss Robot Co., Ltd No. 131, Binhai 4th Road Hangzhou Bay New Area Ningbo, Zhejiang 315336 / CN | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Jingchen Ningbo / CN | 02 /
LI, Zhiqing Ningbo / CN | 03 /
QIAN, Hanxin Ningbo / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Miao Ningbo / CN | 05 /
GUO, Qiyin Ningbo / CN | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Bayramoglu et al. Mira Office Kanuni Sultan Süleyman Boulevard 5387 Street Beytepe, floor 12, no:50 06800 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23199511.9 | 25.09.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | CN202211445250 | 18.11.2022 Original published format: CN202211445250 | CN202211631708 | 19.12.2022 Original published format: CN202211631708 | CN202310123613 | 16.02.2023 Original published format: CN202310123613 | CN202310258591 | 17.03.2023 Original published format: CN202310258591 | CN202310810232 | 03.07.2023 Original published format: CN202310810232 | [2024/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371793 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/0165, B60G17/019, B60G17/06 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B60G17/0165 (EP,US);
B60G17/0157 (US);
B60G17/01908 (EP);
B60G17/06 (EP);
B60G2202/42 (US);
B60G2400/0511 (EP);
B60G2400/0512 (EP);
B60G2400/0521 (EP);
B60G2400/0522 (EP);
B60G2400/204 (EP);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2400/82 (EP);
B60G2400/823 (EP,US);
B60G2400/824 (EP);
B60G2401/174 (EP);
B60G2401/21 (EP);
B60G2401/28 (EP);
B60G2401/904 (EP);
B60G2500/10 (EP,US);
B60G2600/02 (EP);
B60G2600/124 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES AKTIVEN DÄMPFUNGSMECHANISMUS MIT MEHREREN FREIHEITSGRADEN, SYSTEM UND DÄMPFUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2024/21] | English: | MULTI-DEGREE-OF-FREEDOM ACTIVE DAMPING MECHANISM CONTROL METHOD, SYSTEM AND DAMPING MECHANISM | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MÉCANISME D'AMORTISSEMENT ACTIF À DEGRÉS DE LIBERTÉ MULTIPLES, SYSTÈME ET MÉCANISME D'AMORTISSEMENT | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE112020000574T (HITACHI ASTEMO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP3932704 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US2022032709 (LEE JIN HEE [KR], et al); | [A]US2022088988 (MENDEN BRADLEY [US], et al) |