EP4275497 - SYNERGISTICALLY EFFECTIVE HERBICIDE COMPOSITION COMPRISING PELARGONIC ACID AND FLAZASULFURON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - classification | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - classification | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certis Belchim NV Technologielaan 7 1840 Londerzeel / BE | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESNOUCK, Johan 1840 Londerzeel / BE | 02 /
VAN POTTELBERGE, Steven 1840 Londerzeel / BE | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Brantsandpatents bv Pauline Van Pottelsberghelaan 24 9051 Ghent / BE | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 23199742.0 | 16.10.2018 | [2023/46] | Priority number, date | EP20170196688 | 16.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17196688 | [2023/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4275497 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4275497 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/02, A01N47/36, A01P13/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A01N37/02 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (US);
A01N47/36 (EP);
A01P13/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N37/02, A01N47/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | A01P13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCH WIRKSAME HERBIZIDZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT PELARGONSÄURE UND FLAZASULFURON | [2023/46] | English: | SYNERGISTICALLY EFFECTIVE HERBICIDE COMPOSITION COMPRISING PELARGONIC ACID AND FLAZASULFURON | [2023/46] | French: | COMPOSITION HERBICIDE À EFFET SYNERGIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'ACIDE PÉLARGONIQUE ET DU FLAZASULFURON | [2023/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18783526.9 / EP3697214 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008142391 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0042] ** claims 1, 2, 6 *; | [XI]US2016120179 (KILIAN MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0046] * [I] 8,11 | by applicant | WO2011080296 | US9609865 | - COLBY, S. R, "Calculating synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide combinations", Weeds, (19670000), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 |