EP4372179 - COVERING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parador GmbH Millenkamp 7 - 8 48653 Coesfeld / DE | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petersen, Frank 48653 Coesfeld / DE | 02 /
Dekomien, Martina 45657 Recklinghausen / DE | 03 /
Holterhaus, Franziska 48683 Ahaus / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 23200079.4 | 27.09.2023 | [2024/21] | Priority number, date | DE20221004252 | 17.11.2022 Original published format: DE102022004252 | [2024/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4372179 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, E04F15/10, E04F13/08, B32B21/02, B32B21/04, B32B7/12 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
E04F15/02038 (EP,US);
E04F13/0866 (EP,US);
B32B21/02 (EP,US);
B32B21/042 (EP,US);
B32B21/047 (EP,US);
B32B21/06 (EP);
B32B21/08 (EP);
B32B21/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/40 (EP);
B32B3/06 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B37/18 (US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,US);
B32B9/042 (US);
B32B9/045 (US);
E04F13/0867 (US);
E04F13/0894 (EP,US);
E04F15/102 (EP);
E04F15/105 (EP);
E04F15/107 (EP,US);
E04F15/206 (US);
B32B2255/08 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (US);
B32B2266/025 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2307/51 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2307/554 (US);
B32B2307/7376 (EP,US);
B32B2317/02 (US);
B32B2317/16 (US);
B32B2419/00 (US);
B32B2607/00 (EP);
E04F2201/0115 (US);
E04F2201/023 (US);
E04F2201/043 (US);
E04F2290/044 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2024/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELAGSELEMENT | [2024/21] | English: | COVERING ELEMENT | [2024/21] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE REVÊTEMENT | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2011129755 (CERALOC INNOVATION BELGIUM [BE], et al); | [Y]DE102017003640 (PARADOR GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2018283014 (HODGKINS CLARK [US], et al) |