EP4345520 - IMAGING LENS ASSEMBLY MODULE, CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Largan Precision Co. Ltd. No. 11, Jingke Rd. Nantun District Taichung City 408 / TW | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Lin-An 408 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
CHEN, Chung Hao 408 Taichung City / TW | 03 /
TSAI, Wen-Yu 408 Taichung City / TW | 04 /
CHOU, Ming-Ta 408 Taichung City / TW | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 23200338.4 | 28.09.2023 | [2024/14] | Priority number, date | US202263377730P | 30.09.2022 Original published format: US 202263377730 P | [2024/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4345520 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G02B13/00, G02B17/08, G02B27/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G02B27/0018 (EP);
G02B13/0065 (CN);
G02B17/0856 (EP,US);
G02B1/11 (CN);
G02B13/002 (CN,US);
G02B13/0045 (EP);
G02B13/007 (EP,CN);
G02B5/22 (CN);
G02B7/021 (EP);
G02B7/026 (EP);
G03B11/00 (CN);
G03B17/12 (CN);
G03B30/00 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSLINSENANORDNUNGSMODUL, KAMERAMODUL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2024/14] | English: | IMAGING LENS ASSEMBLY MODULE, CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2024/14] | French: | MODULE D'ENSEMBLE LENTILLE D'IMAGERIE, MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/14] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/14] | 02.10.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018024336 (CHOI JONG-CHUL [KR], et al); | [XAI]CN111756958 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO); | [A]CN217238501U (LARGAN PRECISION CO LTD ) |