EP4349309 - OPHTHALMOLOGICAL PATIENT INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ziemer Ophthalmic Systems AG Allmendstrasse 11 2562 Port / CH | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNAU, Werner 3098 Köniz / CH | 02 /
MÜLLER, Fabian 2502 Biel / CH | 03 /
RATHJEN, Christian 28197 Bremen / DE | 04 /
STEINLECHNER, Michael 8006 Zürich / CH | 05 /
STUDER, Thomas 3286 Muntelier / CH | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 23200904.3 | 29.09.2023 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | CH20220001157 | 04.10.2022 Original published format: CH 11572022 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349309 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008, A61F9/009 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61F9/008 (EP);
A61F9/009 (EP,US);
A61B2017/306 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE | [2024/15] | English: | OPHTHALMOLOGICAL PATIENT INTERFACE | [2024/15] | French: | INTERFACE OPHTALMOLOGIQUE POUR PATIENT | [2024/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1306068 (CARRIAZO CESAR C DR [CO]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0016] * * figures 5,6,8 *; | [XAY]DE102014225635 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10,11 * paragraphs [0031] , [0049] - [0053] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 12-15 [Y] 8; | [X]US2017290703 (TEUMA E VALAS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0073] - [0092] * * figures 3-6 *; | [Y]EP3323393 (ZIEMER OPHTHALMIC SYSTEMS AG [CH]) [Y] 8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0023] , [0037] * |