EP4357549 - NON-POROUS AND HYDROPHOBIC ROOFING ELEMENT, AND BUILDING ROOF COMPRISING SUCH A ROOFING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMASSON, Damien 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
TERREAU, Guillaume 63040 CLERMONT-FERRAND CEDEX 09 / FR | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23201301.1 | 02.10.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | FR20220010316 | 07.10.2022 Original published format: FR 2210316 | [2024/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357549 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | E04D1/20 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
E04D1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHTPORÖSES UND HYDROPHOBES DACHELEMENT UND DACH EINES BAUWERKS MIT EINEM SOLCHEN DACHELEMENT | [2024/17] | English: | NON-POROUS AND HYDROPHOBIC ROOFING ELEMENT, AND BUILDING ROOF COMPRISING SUCH A ROOFING ELEMENT | [2024/17] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE TOITURE NON POREUX ET HYDROPHOBE, ET TOITURE D'UNE CONSTRUCTION COMPRENANT UN TEL ÉLÉMENT DE TOITURE | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 26.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6808785 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [A]US2007266562 (FRIEDMAN MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [A]US2011056148 (JENKINS ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]US7934346 (MACKINNON THOMAS KEVIN [US], et al); | [A]US8136322 (SHADWELL PETER [US], et al); | [A]US2015143767 (ALLEN CLYDE G [US], et al); | [A]US2020199874 (HAYNES ANDREW LEO [NZ]) | by applicant | FR2724961 |