Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4278982 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4278982



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 187
09.08.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.08.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
09.08.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
09.08.2024 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
09.08.2024 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
09.08.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
09.08.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.02.2024 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.01.2024 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2024 European search opinion Search / examination 3
24.01.2024 European search report Search / examination 2
24.01.2024 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.12.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.12.2023 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 3
01.12.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.12.2023 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
25.10.2023 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.10.2023 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.10.2023 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.10.2023 Annex Search / examination 4
03.10.2023 Claims Search / examination 2
03.10.2023 Description Search / examination 34
03.10.2023 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.2023 Drawings Search / examination 14
03.10.2023 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
12.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
12.02.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33