EP4279706 - TURBOFAN ENGINE WITH GEARED ARCHITECTURE AND LPC BLADE AIRFOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLAGHER, Edward J. Hartford, 06117 / US | 02 /
BRILLIANT, Lisa I. Middletown, 06457 / US | 03 /
STRACCIA, Joseph C. Middletown, 06457 / US | 04 /
BALAMUCKI, Stanley J. The Villages, 32163 / US | 05 /
STEPHENS, Mark A. Wethersfield, 06109 / US | 06 /
HUDON, Kate Superior, 80027 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 23201457.1 | 12.02.2015 | [2023/47] | Priority number, date | US201461941655P | 19.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461941655 P | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4279706 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4279706 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2023/47] | CPC: |
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F04D29/384 (US);
F01D9/041 (US);
F02C3/04 (US);
F04D29/324 (US);
F04D29/325 (US);
F04D29/544 (US);
F04D29/563 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2240/121 (EP,US);
F05D2240/303 (EP,US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTORSCHAUFEL | [2023/47] | English: | TURBOFAN ENGINE WITH GEARED ARCHITECTURE AND LPC BLADE AIRFOILS | [2023/47] | French: | AUBE DE TURBINE À GAZ | [2023/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15793193.2 / EP3108119 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3867062 (TROLLER THEODOR H) [X] 1 * figure 5 *; | [X]US5211703 (FERLEGER JUREK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * figure 1; table 1 *; | [X]US5221181 (FERLEGER JUREK [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10 * figure 1; table 1 *; | [X]US5277549 (CHEN SHUN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10 * table 1 *; | [X]EP1508669 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10,12,13,15 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP1524405 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [X] 7,10* figure 16 *; | [XY]EP2133573 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0026] , [0029] , [0030]; figure 4 * [Y] 6,13-15; | [X]US2013089415 (BROWN BARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,10 * figures 5,9,17; tables 1,3,7 *; | [Y]US2013192266 (HOUSTON DAVID P [US], et al) [Y] 6,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0059] , [0061] *; | [XY]US2013315739 (CELLIER DAMIEN [FR], et al) [X] 7,8,12 * paragraph [0082]; figures 4,6 * [Y] 11; | [XP]WO2014066503 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 7,9 * figure 7 * |