Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.04.2024 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
03.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
03.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |