Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022213180 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916481241 | 26.07.2019 | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | US202217655687 | 21.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019367600 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102581165B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | B1 | KR20190108152 | 23.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7126658B | Global Dossier | 29.08.2022 | B2 | JPWO2018139608 | 09.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3581204 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2020 | A4 | EP3581204 | 18.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110267680B | Global Dossier | 19.12.2023 | B | CN110267680 | 20.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3051826 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2018213716 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4317431 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | A3 | EP4317431 | 07.02.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | EP18744092 | 26.01.2018 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201906968Y | 27.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | WO2018JP02576 | 26.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018139608 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10202108219Q | 30.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017013486 | 27.01.2017 | Type | Earlier application | EP3581204 |