EP4350718 - MAGNETIC, FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMER SUBSTRATES FOR RADIOFREQUENCY APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thüringisches Institut für Textil- und Kunststoff-Forschung e.V. Breitscheidstrasse 97 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pflug, Günther 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | 02 /
Gladitz, Michael 07318 Saalfeld / DE | 03 /
Reinemann, Stefan 07407 Rudolstadt / DE | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Plate, Jürgen Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwalt Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustraße 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 23201540.4 | 04.10.2023 | [2024/15] | Priority number, date | DE202210125940 | 07.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022125940 | [2024/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4350718 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/34, H01F1/37, H01F1/00 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
H01F1/37 (EP);
C08L9/08 (KR);
C08L45/00 (CN);
H01F1/34 (US);
C08J3/2053 (US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
C08K9/04 (US);
C08L101/12 (KR);
C08L55/02 (CN,KR);
C08L77/02 (CN);
C08L79/02 (KR);
H01F1/348 (EP);
H01Q1/40 (US);
C08J2345/00 (US);
C08J2355/02 (US);
C08K2003/2275 (CN,KR);
C08K2201/005 (KR,US);
C08K2201/01 (CN,KR,US);
H01F1/0063 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L45/00, C08L55/02, C08L77/02, C08L79/02, C08K3/22 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE, FUNKTIONALISIERTE POLYMERSUBSTRATE FÜR HOCHFREQUENZANWENDUNGEN | [2024/15] | English: | MAGNETIC, FUNCTIONALIZED POLYMER SUBSTRATES FOR RADIOFREQUENCY APPLICATIONS | [2024/15] | French: | SUBSTRATS POLYMÈRES MAGNÉTIQUES ET FONCTIONNALISÉS DES POUR APPLICATIONS HAUTE FRÉQUENCE | [2024/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013063296 (HENNIG INGOLF [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2015024911 (BASF SE [DE]); | [A]US2019221343 (CHEN YAJIE [US], et al); | [A]DE102018115503 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]); | by applicant | US2009053512 | US2015255196 | KR20180060496 | WO2018119341 | WO2018140588 | WO2019006184 | WO2019143502 | CN111548612 |