EP4353628 - INSERT CONTAINER DEVICE FOR A WASTE COLLECTION CONTAINER AND WASTE COLLECTION CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESE World B.V. Luxemburglaan 35 6199 AM Maastricht-Airport / NL | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Den Boer, Reinier 5658PK Eindhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Thomas Patentanwalt emescon Balanstraße 57 81541 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 23202143.6 | 06.10.2023 | [2024/16] | Priority number, date | DE202210125894 | 07.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022125894 | DE202210125895 | 07.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022125895 | [2024/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353628 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65F1/00, B65F1/08, B65F1/14, B65F1/16 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
B65F1/006 (EP);
B65F1/08 (EP);
B65F1/004 (EP);
B65F1/1415 (EP);
B65F2210/139 (EP);
B65F2210/181 (EP);
B65F2220/124 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSATZBEHÄLTEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ABFALLSAMMELBEHÄLTER UND ABFALLSAMMELBEHÄLTER | [2024/16] | English: | INSERT CONTAINER DEVICE FOR A WASTE COLLECTION CONTAINER AND WASTE COLLECTION CONTAINER | [2024/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCIPIENT D'INSERTION POUR UN RÉCIPIENT DE COLLECTE DE DÉCHETS ET RÉCIPIENT DE COLLECTE DE DÉCHETS | [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE3524781 (HESCH ROSINA); | [X]FR2853890 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]); | [A]GB2442191 (WALKER ROBERT [GB]); | [X]EP1615845 (ESE WORLD BV [NL]) | by applicant | EP2354042 | EP1615845 |