EP4358383 - BACK-END ENERGY STORAGE ISOLATION FLY-BACK CONVERSION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wisetop Technology Co., Ltd. 6F.-7, No. 472, Sec. 1, Guangfu Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City / TW | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Wei-Chen HSINCHU CITY / TW | 02 /
CHANG, Pin HSINCHU CITY / TW | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23202615.3 | 10.10.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | TW20220211441U | 20.10.2022 Original published format: TW 111211441 U | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358383 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/00, H02M3/155, H02M3/335, H02M1/42, H02M3/158 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
H02M1/0095 (EP);
H02M3/33507 (EP,KR);
H02M3/33569 (KR,US);
H02M1/4241 (EP);
H02M1/4258 (EP);
H02M3/01 (US);
H02M3/158 (EP);
H02M1/0064 (EP);
H02M1/4225 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] |
Former [2024/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLYBACK-UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT BACK-END-ENERGIESPEICHERISOLIERUNG | [2024/17] | English: | BACK-END ENERGY STORAGE ISOLATION FLY-BACK CONVERSION APPARATUS | [2024/17] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONVERSION DE RETOUR D'INFORMATIONS D'ISOLATION DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE D'EXTRÉMITÉ ARRIÈRE | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6317341 (FRAIDLIN SIMON [US], et al); | [Y]CN109451628 (WUXI YOUDIAN SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) |