EP4287190 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MACHINE LEARNING BASED IDENTIFICATION OF STRUCTURAL VARIANTS IN CANCER GENOMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inocras Korea Inc. T331 Jinri Building Munji Campus 193 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/49] | For all designated states Genome Insight Technology, Inc. T331 Jinri Building Munji Campus 193 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ju, Youngseok DAEJEON / KR | 02 /
Park, Hansol DAEJEON / KR | 03 /
Park, Seongyeol DAEJEON / KR | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 23203162.5 | 17.09.2021 | [2023/49] | Priority number, date | KR20200119798 | 17.09.2020 Original published format: KR 20200119798 | KR20210054190 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210054190 | KR20210123291 | 15.09.2021 Original published format: KR 20210123291 | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4287190 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4287190 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G16B20/20, G16B40/20, G16B30/10, C12Q1/6886, C12Q1/6869 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G16B20/20 (EP,KR,US);
G16B40/00 (US);
C12Q1/6869 (US);
C12Q1/6883 (KR);
G06N20/00 (KR);
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
G16B40/20 (EP,KR,US);
G16B5/00 (KR);
G16B50/00 (KR);
C12Q1/6886 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | G16B30/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE AUF MASCHINELLEM LERNEN BASIERENDE IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON STRUKTURVARIANTEN IN KREBSGENOMEN | [2023/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MACHINE LEARNING BASED IDENTIFICATION OF STRUCTURAL VARIANTS IN CANCER GENOMES | [2023/49] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL POUR L'IDENTIFICATION DE VARIANTS STRUCTURELS DANS LES GÉNOMES DU CANCER BASÉE SUR L'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2023/49] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21197318.5 / EP4016533 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019189242 (ANGIUOLI SAMUEL V [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0090] , [ 107] , [ 112] , [ 124] , [ 166] , [ 167]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2020035446 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0135] , [ 154] - [0164]; figure 4 *; | [A] - KUHN MATTHIAS ET AL, "Finding small somatic structural variants in exome sequencing data: a machine learning approach", COMPUTATIONAL STATISTICS, PHYSICA VERLAG, DE, vol. 33, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00180-016-0674-2, ISSN 0943-4062, (20160810), pages 1145 - 1158, (20160810), XP036537640 [A] 1-12 * p. 1148 to 1151, section "Algorithm" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00180-016-0674-2 | [A] - ZEV N. KRONENBERG ET AL, "Wham: Identifying Structural Variants of Biological Consequence", PLOS COMPUTATIONAL BIOLOGY, (20151201), vol. 7, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pcbi.1004572, page e1002216, XP055334268 [A] 1-12 * section "Design and Implementation", in particular "Identification of breakpoints an genotyping" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pcbi.1004572 |