EP4299123 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING CHONDROGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Ha-Soon San Diego, 92121 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Jiqing San Diego, 92121 / US | 03 /
LAJINESS, James Paul San Diego, 92121 / US | 04 /
NGUYEN, Bao San Diego, 92121 / US | 05 /
PETRASSI, Hank Michael James San Diego, 92121 / US | 06 /
WANG, Zhicheng San Diego, 92121 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Mueller, Philippe Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 23203447.0 | 07.06.2018 | [2024/01] | Priority number, date | US201762517394P | 09.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762517394 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4299123 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4299123 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D493/08, A61K45/06, A61P19/02 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
C07D493/08 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP,EA,IL,KR);
A61K31/343 (IL,US);
A61K31/4427 (KR);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
C12N5/0655 (KR);
C12N2501/999 (KR);
C12N2506/14 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | A61P19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INDUKTION VON CHONDROGENESE | [2024/01] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING CHONDROGENESIS | [2024/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS D'INDUCTION DE LA CHONDROGENÈSE | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18737718.9 / EP3634967 | EP21178695.9 / EP3915994 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]WO2015175487 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) | by applicant | WO2011008773 | WO2012129562 | WO2015175487 |