EP4356738 - DOUGH PROCESSING DEVICE AND DOUGH PROCESSING SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A DOUGH PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.09.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WP Kemper GmbH Lange Straße 8 - 10 33397 Rietberg / DE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oestersötebier, Felix 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 23203545.1 | 13.10.2023 | [2024/17] | Priority number, date | DE202210211144 | 20.10.2022 Original published format: DE102022211144 | [2024/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4356738 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4356738 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A21C5/04, A21C13/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A21C5/04 (EP);
A21C13/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/42] |
Former [2024/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEIGBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE TEIGBEARBEITUNGSANLAGE MIT EINER DERARTIGEN TEIGBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/17] | English: | DOUGH PROCESSING DEVICE AND DOUGH PROCESSING SYSTEM HAVING SUCH A DOUGH PROCESSING DEVICE | [2024/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PÂTE AINSI QU'INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE PÂTE DOTÉE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PÂTE | [2024/17] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/42] | 09.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2004159247 (ROTHAMMEL NORBERT [DE], et al); | [XY]WO2007001175 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER HATON BV [NL], et al); | [XAY]EP2901860 (WP KEMPER GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2017042107 (WP KEMPER GMBH [DE]); | [XY]WO2017146578 (STICHTING BLUE VALUE [NL]); | [XAY]EP3815535 (C S C SARTORI S R L [IT]) | by applicant | DD231483 | DE202004012523U | WO2017042107 | DE102022211144 |