EP4541671 - UNDERSTEER MITIGATION FOR ELECTRIC TRACTOR TRAILER VEHICLE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 21.03.2025 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2025 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.04.2025 [2025/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2025/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GELSO, Esteban SE-421 51 VÄSTRA FRÖLUNDA / SE | 02 /
ERDINC, Umur SE-413 26 GÖTEBORG / SE | 03 /
SADEGHI KATI, Maliheh SE-433 51 ÖJERSJÖ / SE | 04 /
LAINE, Leo SE-414 84 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2025/17] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2025/17] | Application number, filing date | 23203836.4 | 16.10.2023 | [2025/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4541671 | Date: | 23.04.2025 | Language: | EN | [2025/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/10, B60L7/10, B60L7/18, B60L7/26, B60L15/20, B60T8/17, B60T8/1755, B60T8/26, B60W30/18 | [2025/17] | CPC: |
B60T1/10 (EP);
B60W30/045 (US);
B60L15/2009 (EP);
B60L15/2045 (EP);
B60L7/10 (EP);
B60L7/18 (EP);
B60L7/26 (EP);
B60T7/20 (EP);
B60T8/1708 (EP);
B60T8/1887 (EP);
B60W10/08 (US);
B60W10/18 (US);
B60W30/18127 (EP);
B60T2270/604 (EP);
B60W2300/145 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2025/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNTERSTEUERUNGSMINDERUNG FÜR EINE KOMBINATION AUS EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN TRAKTORANHÄNGERFAHRZEUG | [2025/17] | English: | UNDERSTEER MITIGATION FOR ELECTRIC TRACTOR TRAILER VEHICLE COMBINATION | [2025/17] | French: | ATTÉNUATION DE SOUS-VIRAGE POUR COMBINAISON DE VÉHICULE DE REMORQUE DE TRACTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2025/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6668225 (OH PAHNGROC [US], et al); | [X]US7093912 (BROWN TODD ALLEN [US], et al); | [Y]US10131330 (ROBERTSON STEPHEN L [US]); | [X]US10336195 (SUZUKI KEISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US2019285501 (JENSEN KENNETH JAMES [US], et al); | [XYI]DE102019200820 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [A]WO2022184258 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]); | [A]WO2022253411 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]); | [A]US2023068987 (LAINE LEO [SE], et al); | [A]US2023242121 (SALIF RAMADAN [SE], et al) |