EP4290539 - SYSTEM FOR PROTETION OF DRY TYPE TRANSFORMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Energy Ltd Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDELL, Elisabeth 722 14 Västerås / SE | 02 /
LILJESTRAND, Lars 722 42 Västerås / SE | 03 /
GREUTER, Felix 5406 Baden-Rütihof / CH | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 23203847.1 | 19.11.2015 | [2023/50] | Priority number, date | US201414550394 | 21.11.2014 Original published format: US201414550394 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4290539 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4290539 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/34, H01F27/40, H02H9/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
H01F27/343 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02H9/005 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01F27/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02H9/04 (CN,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | H01F27/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/41] |
Former [2023/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ VON TROCKENTRANSFORMATOREN | [2023/50] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROTETION OF DRY TYPE TRANSFORMERS | [2023/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION DE TRANSFORMATEURS DE TYPE SEC | [2023/50] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2024 | Examination requested [2024/41] | 05.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15797328.0 / EP3221873 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5680109 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 4,5* abstract *; | [IAY]EP0078985 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [I] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 11, line 33 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 1-3,6-8; | [A]JPS61107709 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 4,5 * abstract *; | [A]US2014035710 (BONMANN DIETRICH [DE], et al) [A] 4,5 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 5,7,8 * * page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 3, paragraphs 25-31 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]EP2747098 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [Y] 1-3,6-8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 15 * * page 6, paragraph 49 - page 7, paragraph 55; figures 9,10 * [A] 4,5 | by applicant | US4604673 |