EP4385938 - VALVE DEVICE FOR AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Industrietechnik GmbH Halberstädter Strasse 15-19 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebbes, Björn 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 23204245.7 | 18.10.2023 | [2024/25] | Priority number, date | DE202210133427 | 15.12.2022 Original published format: DE102022133427 | [2024/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4385938 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/22, F15B11/044 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B66F9/22 (EP);
F15B11/048 (EP);
F15B13/0405 (EP);
F15B13/0433 (EP);
F15B20/005 (EP);
F15B11/006 (EP);
F15B13/023 (EP);
F15B2211/30575 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/329 (EP);
F15B2211/351 (EP);
F15B2211/353 (EP);
F15B2211/355 (EP);
F15B2211/50518 (EP);
F15B2211/526 (EP);
F15B2211/55 (EP);
F15B2211/6336 (EP);
F15B2211/6355 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FLURFÖRDERZEUG | [2024/25] | English: | VALVE DEVICE FOR AN INDUSTRIAL TRUCK | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE POUR UN CHARIOT DE MANUTENTION | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05254794 ; | [A]JP2001193709 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD); | [A]EP2508465 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]); | [A]WO2015049828 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) | by applicant | EP2508465 |